WI SB134 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-14 - Read a third time and concurred in as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-14 - Read a third time and concurred in as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.613 (2) (intro.), 71.613 (2) (a), 71.613 (2) (b), 71.613 (2) (c), 91.04 (intro.) and 91.62 (1) (a); and to create 71.613 (1) (h) 4., 71.613 (2) (am), 71.613 (2) (bm), 71.613 (2) (cm), 71.613 (2) (d), 71.613 (2e) and 91.04 (2) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: farmland preservation agreements and tax credits. (FE)
Title
Farmland preservation agreements and tax credits. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-14 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2023-11-14 | House | Representatives Cabrera, Drake and Rozar added as cosponsors |
2023-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-14 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2023-11-13 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Oldenburg |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-09-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 1 |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced |