WI SB131 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on December 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on December 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 59.76 (2); to renumber 59.76 (1); to renumber and amend 236.34 (3); to consolidate, renumber and amend 59.43 (9) (a) 1. a. and g. and 59.43 (9) (c) (intro.), 1. and 2.; to amend 59.43 (1c) (k), 59.43 (9) (a) 2. c., 59.43 (9) (b), 59.71 (3), 61.187 (2) (d), 69.64 (2), 70.25, 70.27 (5), 75.28 (2) (a), 84.095 (3) (a), 84.095 (7) (a), 84.095 (8) (b), 185.82 (2) (c), 186.315, 228.05, 236.295 (2) (a), 321.61 (1) (f), 703.11 (2) (am), 703.275 (5), 706.05 (2) (c), 706.05 (2m) (a), 706.085 (2) (a), 708.15 (1) (L) and 893.33 (2); and to create 236.34 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: identification and location information assigned to documents filed or recorded in the county register of deeds offices and registration of farm names by recording in the register of deeds office. (FE)
Title
Identification and location information assigned to documents filed or recorded in the county register of deeds offices and registration of farm names by recording in the register of deeds office. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-04 | Senate | Published 12-1-2017 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-30-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 102 |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-20 | Senate | LRB correction |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced |