WI SB130 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 442.083; to amend 442.04 (5) (b) 3., 442.083 (title) and 442.087 (4); and to create 442.01 (4), 442.04 (6), 442.083 (2) and 442.087 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: educational requirements for taking the accounting examination or receiving a certified public accountant certificate; continuing education requirements for accounting license renewal; data-sharing programs related to accountants; peer reviews for certified public accounting firms; modifying various administrative rules promulgated by the Accounting Examining Board relating to accounting; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Educational requirements for taking the accounting examination or receiving a certified public accountant certificate; continuing education requirements for accounting license renewal; data-sharing programs related to accountants; peer reviews for certified public accounting firms; modifying various administrative rules promulgated by the Accounting Examining Board relating to accounting; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senator Johnson added as a coauthor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb130 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB130.pdf |