WI SB13 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Published 5-1-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Published 5-1-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 70.365 of the statutes; Relating to: notification of changed property tax assessment for agricultural land. (FE)
Title
Notification of changed property tax assessment for agricultural land. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Published 5-1-2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-30-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 2 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-25-2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-04-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Read a second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2019-04-09 | House | Read |
2019-04-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-9-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Feyen |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |