WI SB13 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 3.002 (2); to consolidate, renumber and amend 3.002 (intro.) and (1m); to amend 3.004 (2) and 5.15 (4) (a); to repeal and recreate subchapter I of chapter 4 [precedes 4.001]; and to create 13.49 of the statutes; Relating to: legislative and congressional redistricting. (FE)
Title
Legislative and congressional redistricting. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Representative Young added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Utilities |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb13 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB13.pdf |