WI SB13 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Published 3-24-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Published 3-24-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 450.03 (1) (e), 450.08 (2) (b) and 450.11 (3); and to create 440.08 (2) (a) 38h. and 450.076 of the statutes; Relating to: licensure of home medical oxygen providers, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Licensure of home medical oxygen providers, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | Published 3-24-2015 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-23-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 3 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-20-2015 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-03-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a second time |
2015-03-17 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2015-03-17 | House | Read |
2015-03-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 11 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |