WI SB127 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 978.001 (1p) and 978.11; to renumber and amend 977.08 (3) (b); to amend 13.093 (2) (a), 16.971 (9), 16.971 (10), 230.08 (2) (e) 7., 230.33 (1), 977.02 (5), 977.08 (3) (c), 977.08 (4m) (c), 978.03, 978.045 (1g), 978.045 (1r) (bm) (intro.), 978.045 (2), 978.05 (9) and 978.12 (1) (c); and to create 13.0967, 15.77, 20.548, 20.923 (4) (f) 7x., 227.118, 227.19 (3) (em), 230.08 (2) (qp), 230.12 (13), 977.08 (3) (b) 2., 977.08 (4m) (d), 978.001 (1b), (1d) and (1n), 978.003, 978.004 and 978.005 of the statutes; Relating to: creation of a prosecutor board and a state prosecutors office; funding for the department of justice, assistant district attorneys, the public defender, and the courts; Public Defender Board regulation, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creation of a prosecutor board and a state prosecutors office; funding for the department of justice, assistant district attorneys, the public defender, and the courts; Public Defender Board regulation, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb127 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB127.pdf |