WI SB125 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.445 (1) (b) and 20.445 (1) (bm); and to create 106.275 of the statutes; Relating to: technical education equipment grants for school districts, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Technical education equipment grants for school districts, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb125 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB125.pdf |