WI SB124 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-07 - Published 12-7-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-07 - Published 12-7-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 341.09 (2m) (a) 2. and 341.09 (2m) (d); and to create 341.09 (2m) (a) 1m. and 341.09 (10) of the statutes; Relating to: issuance of temporary motor vehicle operation plates and permits to dealers and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Issuance of temporary motor vehicle operation plates and permits to dealers and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-07 | Senate | Published 12-7-2023 |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 45 |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023 |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2023-10-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-10-17 | House | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-17 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2023-10-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-10-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-17 | House | Read a second time |
2023-10-17 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2023-10-12 | House | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-11 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-06-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Introduced |