WI SB122 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 61.25 (intro.), 61.26 (1), 61.28 (1), 61.29 (1) (a), 62.09 (4) (b), 66.0609 (4), 755.03 (1) and 755.03 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: changing the requirement that certain city and village officials must execute and file an official bond. (FE)
Title
Changing the requirement that certain city and village officials must execute and file an official bond. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | Published 8-3-2017 |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 8-2-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 51 |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 8-1-2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-14 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2017-06-14 | House | Read |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced |