WI SB121 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Public hearing held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 16.3075, 20.505 (7) (fp) and 20.505 (7) (hp) of the statutes; Relating to: housing quality standards loans, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing quality standards loans, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13SenatePublic hearing held
2019-07-23SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier
2019-05-03SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-04-03SenateRepresentative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
2019-03-26SenateRepresentative Novak added as a cosponsor
2019-03-20SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing
2019-03-20SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback