WI SB120 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-09 - Published 8-7-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-09 - Published 8-7-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0511 (2); and to create 66.0511 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: law enforcement agency policies on the use of force.
Title
Law enforcement agency policies on the use of force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate: Refused to nonconcur in Assembly Amendment 1 (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-09 | Senate | Published 8-7-2021 |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 8-6-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 75 |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 8-5-2021 |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Refused to nonconcur in Assembly Amendment 1, Ayes 12, Noes 20 |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-30-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 60, Noes 38 |
2021-06-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-21 | House | Representative Brostoff withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2021-06-21 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-14 | House | Read first time and referred to calendar of 6-16-2021 |
2021-06-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 2 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Representative Drake added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Representative L. Myers added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Representative Shelton added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Representative Brostoff added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced |