WI SB12 | 2011 | January Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Published 4-7-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Published 4-7-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.866 (2) (xf) and 49.175 (1) (zh) of the statutes; and to affect 2007 Wisconsin Act 20, section 9201 (1c) (a) and 2009 Wisconsin Act 28, section 9222 (1d); relating to: state finances, the Medical Assistance program, granting bonding authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
State finances, the Medical Assistance program, granting bonding authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Refused to take Senate amendment 1 from table and take up (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Refused to take Senate amendment 1 from table and take up (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Published 4-7-2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 13 | |
2011-04-05 | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-5-2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2011-04-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2011-04-05 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 58, Noes 36 | |
2011-04-05 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-05 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2011-04-05 | Assembly amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 55, Noes 39 | |
2011-04-05 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representatives D. Cullen, Young and Sinicki | |
2011-04-05 | Assembly amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 56, Noes 38 | |
2011-04-05 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Barca, Seidel, Pope-Roberts, Roys and Hulsey | |
2011-04-05 | Read a second time | |
2011-04-05 | Read first time and referred to calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Received from Senate | |
2011-04-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2011-04-05 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 11 | |
2011-04-05 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-05 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2011-04-05 | Senate amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 | |
2011-04-05 | Senate amendment 4 offered by Senator Lassa | |
2011-04-05 | Senate amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 | |
2011-04-05 | Senate amendment 3 offered by Senators Miller, Risser, Carpenter, Vinehout, Hansen, Lassa, Erpenbach, C. Larson and Taylor | |
2011-04-05 | Senate amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 | |
2011-04-05 | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senators Miller, Risser, Carpenter, Vinehout, Hansen, Lassa, Erpenbach, C. Larson and Taylor | |
2011-04-05 | Refused to take Senate amendment 1 from table and take up, Ayes 14, Noes 19 | |
2011-04-05 | Senate amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 | |
2011-04-05 | Read a second time | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on calendar 4-5-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2011-04-04 | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m) | |
2011-04-04 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2011-04-04 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Carpenter | |
2011-04-04 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-04-01 | Emergency statement attached by Governor pursuant to s. 16.47 (2) Wisconsin Statutes | |
2011-03-31 | Available for scheduling | |
2011-03-31 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | |
2011-03-31 | Introduced |