WI SB12 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Published 7-24-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Published 7-24-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 30.66 (3) (a), 30.66 (3) (b) and 30.69 (3) (d); and to create 30.66 (3) (ag), 30.66 (3) (ar) and 30.66 (3) (c) of the statutes; relating to: the operation of motorboats, other than personal watercraft, at slow-no-wake speed within a given distance of the shoreline of a lake.
Title
The operation of motorboats, other than personal watercraft, at slow-no-wake speed within a given distance of the shoreline of a lake.
Sponsors
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Spencer Black [D] | Rep. Fred Clark [D] | Rep. Steve Hilgenberg [D] |
Sen. Jim Holperin [D] | Sen. Bob Jauch [D] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Sen. John Lehman [D] |
Sen. Mark Miller [D] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Louis Molepske [D] | Rep. Louis Molepske [D] |
Rep. Sandra Pasch [D] | Rep. Jon Richards [D] | Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Sen. Kelda Roys [D] |
Rep. Gary Sherman [D] | Rep. Robert Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | Published 7-24-2009. | |
2009-07-10 | Report approved by the Governor on 7-10-2009. 2009 Wisconsin Act 31 | |
2009-07-09 | Presented to the Governor on 7-9-2009 | |
2009-04-27 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-27-2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Action ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-04-23 | Assembly amendment 1 concurred in | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on calendar 4-23-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-03-26 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-03-26 | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-03-26 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-03-26 | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 70, Noes 27 | |
2009-03-26 | Rules suspended | |
2009-03-26 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-03-26 | Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-03-26 | Read a second time | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on calendar 3-26-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-03-19 | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 13, Noes 1 | |
2009-03-19 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | |
2009-03-18 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Natural Resources | |
2009-03-18 | Executive action taken | |
2009-03-11 | Public hearing held | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources | |
2009-02-24 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-24 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-02-24 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-02-24 | Rules suspended | |
2009-02-24 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-02-24 | Read a second time | |
2009-02-20 | Placed on calendar 2-24-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-02-20 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-02-20 | Report passage recommended by committee on Environment, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken | |
2009-02-11 | Public hearing held | |
2009-02-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-01-21 | Read first time and referred to committee on Environment | |
2009-01-21 | Introduced |