WI SB119 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-9)
Status: Passed on December 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-9)
Status: Passed on December 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 961.55 (8); to amend 94.67 (2) and 97.02; and to create 20.115 (7) (gc), 94.55, 348.27 (18) (a) 1. e., 961.32 (3), 961.55 (8) (b) and 961.55 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: growing and processing industrial hemp, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Growing and processing industrial hemp, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-09 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-04 | Senate | Published 12-1-2017 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-30-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 100 |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-20 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Representatives Barca and Spreitzer added as cosponsors |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 92, Noes 0 |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 32 |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Considine, Barca, Berceau, Brostoff, Crowley, Hebl, Meyers, Ohnstad, Pope, Sargent, Shankland, Spreitzer, C. Taylor and Zamarripa |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | House | Read first time and referred to calendar of 11-9-2017 |
2017-11-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Representative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senator Vinehout |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Vinehout |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Vinehout |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Vinehout |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business and Tourism |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced |