WI SB118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Representative James added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 134.65 (7) (a) 1. and 134.66 (4) (a) 1.; and to create 134.66 (2) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: placement of cigarettes, nicotine products, or tobacco products by retailers and providing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Placement of cigarettes, nicotine products, or tobacco products by retailers and providing a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateRepresentative James added as a cosponsor
2019-04-04SenatePublic hearing held
2019-03-25SenateRepresentative Shankland added as a cosponsor
2019-03-20SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development
2019-03-20SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback