WI SB115 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 23.145 of the statutes; Relating to: telecommunications systems installed on tower sites under the management and control of the Department of Natural Resources and the suspension of portions of a rule of the Department of Natural Resources.
Title
Telecommunications systems installed on tower sites under the management and control of the Department of Natural Resources and the suspension of portions of a rule of the Department of Natural Resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Natural Resources, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to committee on Natural Resources |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-7-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26 (2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s.227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Natural Resources |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb115 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB115.pdf |