WI SB114 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: waiving the Foundations of Reading test licensure requirement during a national health emergency declared in response to COVID-19.
Title
Waiving the Foundations of Reading test licensure requirement during a national health emergency declared in response to COVID-19.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Larson |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced |