WI SB113 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-16)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-16)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.05 (1) (c) and 17.20 (1) of the statutes; relating to: the appointment and term of service of the secretary of natural resources and vacancies on the Natural Resources Board.
Title
The appointment and term of service of the secretary of natural resources and vacancies on the Natural Resources Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-09-03 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-09-03 | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | |
2009-09-03 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-03 | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Grothman | |
2009-08-13 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-03-13 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb113 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB113.pdf |