WI SB112 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.34 (1k) (g) and 71.45 (2) (a) 10.; and to create 71.07 (8b), 71.10 (4) (cs), 71.28 (8b), 71.30 (3) (cs), 71.47 (8b) and 71.49 (1) (cs) of the statutes; Relating to: a tax credit for hiring certain apprentices from the Milwaukee Institute of Art and Design. (FE)
Title
A tax credit for hiring certain apprentices from the Milwaukee Institute of Art and Design. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb112 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB112.pdf |