WI SB112 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 59.69 (3) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: changing the elements that must be included in a county development plan. (FE)
Title
Changing the elements that must be included in a county development plan. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Local Government |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb112 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB112.pdf |