WI SB111 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: state finances and appropriations, constituting the executive budget act of the 2021 legislature. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State finances and appropriations, constituting the executive budget act of the 2021 legislature. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2021-06-30SenateLaid on table
2021-06-30SenatePlaced on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 6-30-2021
2021-06-29SenatePlaced on calendar 6-30-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-06-28SenateReport of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
2021-06-28SenateExecutive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions
2021-06-25SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-06-25SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
2021-06-25SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
2021-06-25SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4
2021-06-24SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Joint Committee on Finance
2021-06-22SenateReport of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested
2021-06-17SenateExecutive action taken
2021-06-15SenateExecutive action taken
2021-06-10SenateExecutive action taken
2021-06-08SenateExecutive action taken
2021-06-02SenateExecutive action taken
2021-05-27SenateExecutive action taken
2021-05-20SenateExecutive action taken
2021-05-13SenateExecutive action taken
2021-05-06SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance
2021-05-06SenateExecutive action taken
2021-04-28SenatePublic hearing held
2021-04-22SenatePublic hearing held
2021-04-21SenatePublic hearing held
2021-04-09SenatePublic hearing held
2021-04-07SenateAgency briefing held
2021-04-06SenateAgency briefing held
2021-04-05SenateHousing report received pursuant to s. 13.099 (2) Wisconsin Statutes
2021-02-16SenateRead first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback