WI SB111 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Published 3-21-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Published 3-21-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 285.60 (11) of the statutes; relating to: the regulation of indirect sources of air pollution and the suspension of a rule promulgated by the Department of Natural Resources. (FE)
Title
The regulation of indirect sources of air pollution and the suspension of a rule promulgated by the Department of Natural Resources. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate | Published 3-21-2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-7-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 121 |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-5-2012 |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-5-2012 |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2012-02-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2012-02-14 | House | Read first time and referred to calendar of 2-16-2012 |
2012-02-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 3 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read. |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-14-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Natural Resources and Environment, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to committee on Natural Resources and Environment, pursuant to Senate Rule 46 (2)(c) |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-09-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-13-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Joint committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s. 227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26 (2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes. |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Environment |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Introduced |