WI SB110 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 86.191 (6) (a); and to create 86.191 (6) (a) 2. and 86.191 (6) (d) 6. of the statutes; Relating to: advertising on bus shelters located on state trunk highways.
Title
Advertising on bus shelters located on state trunk highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb110 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB110.pdf |