WI SB11 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 86.19 (1g) of the statutes; Relating to: directional signage for the Basilica of St. Josaphat in Milwaukee County.
Title
Directional signage for the Basilica of St. Josaphat in Milwaukee County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Carpenter |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb11 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB11.pdf |