WI SB106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Published 11-23-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Published 11-23-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 97.41 (4) (a) and 97.41 (4) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: micro market licensing fees. (FE)
Title
Micro market licensing fees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | Published 11-23-2019 |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-22-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 51 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |