WI SB106 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.34 (1k) (g) and 71.45 (2) (a) 10.; and to create 71.07 (8b), 71.10 (4) (cs), 71.28 (8b), 71.30 (3) (cs), 71.47 (8b) and 71.49 (1) (cs) of the statutes; Relating to: an income and franchise tax credit for businesses that recycle mattresses. (FE)
Title
An income and franchise tax credit for businesses that recycle mattresses. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Shilling [D] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] | Sen. Melissa Agard [D] |
Rep. Dave Considine [D] | Rep. David Crowley [D] | Rep. Jill Billings [D] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Shilling |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb106 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB106.pdf |