WI SB104 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 961.34 (2) (b); to renumber subchapter XIV of chapter 440 [precedes 440.99] and 961.32; to renumber and amend 961.34 (2) (a); to amend 450.03 (1) (e), 961.14 (4) (t), 961.38 (1n) and 961.52 (2) (a) 1. and 2.; and to create 440.08 (2) (a) 20r., subchapter XIV of chapter 440 [precedes 440.989], 450.07 (2m), 450.071 (1m) and 961.32 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: production and possession of cannabidiol for treatment of a medical condition and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Production and possession of cannabidiol for treatment of a medical condition and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2017-11-30SenateRepresentative Shankland added as a cosponsor
2017-03-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-09SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2017-03-09SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback