WI SB104 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 16.705 (1n), 16.71 (5m), 20.410 (1) (gk) (title), 946.465, 971.37 (1m) (c) 1. (intro.) and 971.37 (1m) (c) 2.; and to create 20.410 (1) (gL), 301.49, 813.129, 814.75 (8m), 969.02 (3) (e), 973.05 (2m) (jm) and 973.057 of the statutes; relating to: requiring persons who violate certain restraining orders or injunctions to be monitored by a global positioning system, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Requiring persons who violate certain restraining orders or injunctions to be monitored by a global positioning system, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Senate | Published 4-23-2012 |
2012-04-10 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-9-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 266 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-22-2012 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Assembly amendment 1 concurred in |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-13-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2012-03-06 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-06 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2012-03-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-06 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-06 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2012-03-06 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2012-03-02 | House | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-02-27 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative August |
2012-02-24 | House | Printed engrossed by the direction of the Assembly Chief Clerk |
2012-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 2 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Senate amendment 4 adopted |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Senate amendment 4 offered by Senator Grothman |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Senate amendment 3 adopted |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 to Senate amendment 3 adopted |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-14-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 to Senate amendment 3 offered by Senator Zipperer |
2011-07-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-07-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-07-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-07-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Senate amendment 3 offered by Senator Zipperer |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Zipperer |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Zipperer |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Representative Berceau added as a cosponsor |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Introduced |