WI SB1037 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.04045 of the statutes; Relating to: restricting local regulation of utility service based on the type or source of energy. (FE)
Title
Restricting local regulation of utility service based on the type or source of energy. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Introduced |