WI SB102 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
Pending: Senate Universities and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
Pending: Senate Universities and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.07 (6e) (a) 2. b. and 71.07 (6e) (a) 3. d.; and to create 71.07 (6e) (c) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: reducing the eligibility threshold to claim the veterans and surviving spouses property tax credit. (FE)
Title
Reducing the eligibility threshold to claim the veterans and surviving spouses property tax credit. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Representatives Joers, Palmeri, Bare, Steffen and Rettinger added as cosponsors |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Representative Riemer added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |