WI SB102 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.0409 (3) (b); and to create 66.0409 (3) (b) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: local regulation of honorary firearm discharges.
Title
Local regulation of honorary firearm discharges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb102 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB102.pdf |