WI SB101 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 867.03 (1g) (intro.) and 867.03 (1m) (a) and (b), (2) and (2g) (a) and (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the transfer by affidavit option for small estates.
Title
The transfer by affidavit option for small estates.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] |
Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Rep. Terry Katsma [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-04 | Senate | Published 12-1-2017 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-30-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 90 |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 2) |
2017-11-27 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 2 by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced |