WI SB1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Published 5-2-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 84.1052 of the statutes; Relating to: designating and marking a highway interchange in Winnebago County as the Michael G. Ellis Memorial Interchange. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating and marking a highway interchange in Winnebago County as the Michael G. Ellis Memorial Interchange. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenatePublished 5-2-2019
2019-05-01SenateReport approved by the Governor on 5-1-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 3
2019-04-25SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-25-2019
2019-04-11SenateReport correctly enrolled
2019-04-10SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2019-04-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-04-09HouseRepresentative Schraa added as a cosponsor
2019-04-09HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2019-04-09HouseRules suspended
2019-04-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-04-09HouseRead a second time
2019-04-09HouseRules suspended and taken up
2019-04-09HouseRead
2019-04-09HouseReceived from Senate
2019-04-09SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-04-09SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-04-09SenateRules suspended
2019-04-09SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-04-09SenateBernier, Bewley, Carpenter, Craig, Darling, Erpenbach, Feyen, Fitzgerald, Hansen, Jacque, Johnson, Kapenga, Kooyenga, L. Taylor, Larson, LeMahieu, Marklein, Miller, Nass, Olsen, Petrowski, Ringhand, Risser, Schachtner, Shilling, Smith, Stroebel, Testin, Tiffany, Wanggaard and Wirch of the Senate added as coauthors
2019-04-09SenateRead a second time
2019-04-05SenatePlaced on calendar 4-9-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-03-28SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-03-28SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-03-27SenateExecutive action taken
2019-02-20SenatePublic hearing held
2019-02-08SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-01-23SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback