WI SB1 | 2017 | August Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on September 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-18 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 196.192 (2) and 238.399 (4); to renumber and amend 30.195 (7), 61.57, 62.155, 196.192 (1), 196.192 (3) (a), 196.192 (3) (b) and 196.192 (4); to amend 30.123 (6m) (intro.), 66.1105 (2) (f) 1. (intro.), 66.1105 (4) (gm) 4. c., 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.08 (1) (intro.), 71.10 (4) (i), 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.30 (3) (f), 71.34 (1k) (g), 84.0145 (2), 180.0622 (2), 183.0304 (1), 196.491 (1) (f), 238.399 (3) (a), 238.399 (5m), 281.346 (4) (c) 2m., 281.36 (3b) (b) and 281.36 (3m) (a); and to create 16.004 (23), 16.297, 20.395 (6) (ad), 20.505 (1) (fr), 20.835 (2) (cp), 20.866 (2) (uuz), 20.923 (4) (c) 2m., 30.12 (1g) (m), 30.123 (6) (f), 30.19 (1m) (h), 30.195 (7) (b), 61.57 (1) and (2), 62.155 (1) and (2), 66.1105 (20), 71.07 (3w) (bm) 5., 71.07 (3wm), 71.28 (3w) (bm) 5., 71.28 (3wm), 73.0300, 77.54 (65), 84.585, 196.192 (1) (b), 196.192 (2m), 196.49 (5g) (ar) 3., 230.08 (2) (xt), 238.396, 238.399 (3) (e), 238.399 (4) (b), 238.399 (5) (f) and 281.36 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing the creation of an electronics and information technology manufacturing zone, making changes to the enterprise zone tax credit program, authorizing limited use of the design-build construction process, granting contingent highway bonding authority, and making appropriations. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the creation of an electronics and information technology manufacturing zone, making changes to the enterprise zone tax credit program, authorizing limited use of the design-build construction process, granting contingent highway bonding authority, and making appropriations. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-18SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2017-09-19SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-09-12SenateLaid on table
2017-09-12SenateRead a second time
2017-09-07SenatePlaced on calendar 9-12-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-09-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-09-07SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4
2017-09-07SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4
2017-09-07SenateReport introduction of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2017-09-05SenateExecutive action taken
2017-08-28SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-08-24SenateReport of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received, Ayes 6, Noes 2
2017-08-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-08-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-08-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-08-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-08-22SenatePublic hearing held
2017-08-18SenateReport of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested
2017-08-10SenateRead first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance
2017-08-10SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback