WI SB1 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Published 2-17-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 66.1105 (17) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: changing the 12 percent rule regarding the total value of taxable property included in the creation of, or amendment to, a tax incremental financing district in the village of Oostburg. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing the 12 percent rule regarding the total value of taxable property included in the creation of, or amendment to, a tax incremental financing district in the village of Oostburg. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-08 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-17SenatePublished 2-17-2017
2017-02-17SenateReport approved by the Governor on 2-16-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 1
2017-02-14SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-14-2017
2017-02-14SenateReport correctly enrolled
2017-02-09SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2017-02-08HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-02-08HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 97, Noes 0
2017-02-08HouseRules suspended
2017-02-08HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-02-08HouseRead a second time
2017-02-08HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2017-02-06HouseRepresentative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
2017-02-02HousePlaced on calendar 2-8-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-02-02HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-02-02HouseReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2017-02-01HouseExecutive action taken
2017-01-26HousePublic hearing held
2017-01-18HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means
2017-01-18HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-17SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-01-17SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
2017-01-17SenateRules suspended
2017-01-17SenateOrdered to a third reading
2017-01-17SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2017-01-17SenateRead a second time
2017-01-17SenateRules suspended and taken up
2017-01-13SenatePlaced on calendar 1-17-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-01-13SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2017-01-13SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2017-01-13SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator LeMahieu
2017-01-11SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-01-11SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2017-01-11SenateExecutive action taken
2017-01-11SenateRepresentative R. Brooks added as a cosponsor
2017-01-10SenatePublic hearing held
2017-01-10SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-01-05SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government
2017-01-05SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback