WI SB1 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 115.385 (1) (a) 2., 118.42 (2), 118.42 (3) (b) and (c) and 118.42 (4); to renumber and amend 118.40 (3) (b), 118.42 (1), 118.42 (3) (a) (intro.) and 118.42 (3) (a) 1. to 5.; to amend 115.385 (1) (a) (intro.), 115.385 (1) (a) 1., 115.385 (1) (a) 3., 115.385 (1) (b), 115.385 (2), 118.40 (2r) (e) 2p. (intro.), 118.42 (title), 118.60 (2) (a) (intro.), 119.04 (1), 119.23 (2) (a) (intro.) and 121.006 (2) (d); and to create 13.94 (1) (n), 13.94 (1s) (c) 9., 15.07 (2) (o), 15.105 (20), 15.375 (3), 16.105, 115.385 (1) (a) 1m., 115.385 (1) (a) 4., 115.385 (1) (c), 118.40 (2r) (e) 4., 118.40 (3) (b) 2., 118.41, 118.42 (1d), 118.42 (1m) (a) 5., 118.42 (1m) (b), 118.42 (2m), 118.57, 118.60 (2) (bt), 119.23 (2) (bt) and 121.006 (2) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: the school and school district accountability report, chronically failing schools and school districts, and educational options information. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The school and school district accountability report, chronically failing schools and school districts, and educational options information. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-13SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2015-09-02SenateRereferred to committee on Education, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c)
2015-04-23SenateRereferred to committee on Education Reform, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c)
2015-04-15SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Harsdorf
2015-04-14SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Farrow
2015-01-27SenateFiscal estimate received
2015-01-27SenatePublic hearing held
2015-01-26SenateFiscal estimate received
2015-01-16SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Education Reform and Government Operations
2015-01-16SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback