WI SB1 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-14 - Published 2-25-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 13.81 (1) of the statutes; relating to: membership of the Joint Legislative Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Membership of the Joint Legislative Council.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-14SenatePublished 2-25-2011
2011-02-11SenateReport approved by the Governor on 2-11-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 8
2011-02-10SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-10-2011
2011-01-27SenateReport correctly enrolled on 1-27-2011
2011-01-26SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2011-01-25HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2011-01-25HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2011-01-25HouseRules suspended
2011-01-25HouseOrdered to a third reading
2011-01-25HouseRead a second time
2011-01-20HousePlaced on calendar 1-25-2011 by committee on Rules
2011-01-13HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2011-01-11HouseReceived from Senate
2011-01-11SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2011-01-11SenateRead a third time and passed
2011-01-11SenateRules suspended
2011-01-11SenateOrdered to a third reading
2011-01-11SenateRead a second time
2011-01-05SenatePlaced on calendar 1-11-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2011-01-05SenateAvailable for scheduling
2011-01-05SenateReport passage recommended by committee on Senate Organization, Ayes 4, Noes 0
2011-01-05SenateExecutive action taken
2011-01-05SenatePublic hearing held
2011-01-03SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2011-01-03SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback