WI SB1 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 104.001; to renumber 104.01 (1); to renumber and amend 104.045; to amend 49.141 (1) (g), 104.01 (intro.), 104.01 (8), 104.05, 104.07 (1), 104.07 (2), 104.10, 104.11, 234.94 (5), 234.94 (8), 800.09 (1) (b), 800.095 (4) (b) 3. and 895.035 (2m) (c); and to create 104.01 (1d), 104.01 (1g), 104.01 (5g), 104.01 (5m), 104.01 (7m), 104.035 and 104.045 (2) and (3) of the statutes; relating to: a state minimum wage, permitting the enactment of local living wage ordinances, and granting rule-making authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A state minimum wage, permitting the enactment of local living wage ordinances, and granting rule-making authority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-28 Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2010-03-24 Public hearing held
2009-02-12 Read first time and referred to committee on Labor
2009-02-12 Received from Senate
2009-02-10 Ordered immediately messaged
2009-02-10 Read a third time and passed, Ayes 18, Noes 14
2009-02-10 Rules suspended
2009-02-10 Ordered to a third reading
2009-02-10 Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted
2009-02-10 Senate amendment 4 to Senate substitute amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 18, Noes 14
2009-02-10 Senate amendment 4 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Grothman
2009-02-10 Senate amendment 3 to Senate substitute amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 18, Noes 14
2009-02-10 Senate amendment 3 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator S. Fitzgerald
2009-02-10 Senate amendment 2 to Senate substitute amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 18, Noes 14
2009-02-10 Senate amendment 2 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator S. Fitzgerald
2009-02-10 Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted
2009-02-10 Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Decker
2009-02-10 Read a second time
2009-02-05 Placed on calendar 2-10-2009 by committee on Senate Organization
2009-01-30 Available for scheduling
2009-01-30 Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2009-01-30 Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2009-01-29 Executive action taken
2009-01-29 Fiscal estimate received
2009-01-29 Public hearing held
2009-01-23 Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Decker
2009-01-08 Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs
2009-01-08 Introduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback