WI AR8 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing October 10, 2019, as World Mental Health Day.
Title
Recognizing October 10, 2019, as World Mental Health Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-04 | House | Representatives Anderson and Dittrich added as coauthors |
2019-10-03 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-10-03 | House | Introduced |