WI AR4 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing the 40th anniversary of the U.S. Congress's enactment of the Taiwan Relations Act, supporting Taiwan's signing of the Bilateral Trade Agreement (BTA) with the United States, and reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile and for strengthening and expanding sister-state ties between Wisconsin and Taiwan.
Title
Recognizing the 40th anniversary of the U.S. Congress's enactment of the Taiwan Relations Act, supporting Taiwan's signing of the Bilateral Trade Agreement (BTA) with the United States, and reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile and for strengthening and expanding sister-state ties between Wisconsin and Taiwan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar 4-9-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-04-03 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2019-04-02 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-04-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/resolution/ar4 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AR4.pdf |