WI AR10 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the public service of Police Chief Mike Koval.
Title
Honoring the public service of Police Chief Mike Koval.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Plumer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-10-09 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-04 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-10-04 | House | Introduced |