WI AJR99 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and community service of Joyce A. Bytof of Appleton, Wisconsin.
Title
The life and community service of Joyce A. Bytof of Appleton, Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 29 |
2014-06-09 | House | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 6-6-2014 |
2014-03-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Concurred in |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Representatives Steineke, Bernard Schaber and Kaufert added as coauthors |
2014-02-20 | House | Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced |