WI AJR95 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the 100th anniversary of the Girl Scouts of the United States of America.
Title
Honoring the 100th anniversary of the Girl Scouts of the United States of America.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-01-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-01-25 | House | Representative Berceau added as a coauthor |
2012-01-24 | House | Placed on calendar 1-26-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-01-24 | House | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2012-01-23 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-01-23 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr95 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AJR95.pdf |