WI AJR90 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commending the Milwaukee Area Technical College for their dedicated commitment to students, their families, and the Milwaukee area community through their outstanding work in creating the MATC Promise program.
Title
Commending the Milwaukee Area Technical College for their dedicated commitment to students, their families, and the Milwaukee area community through their outstanding work in creating the MATC Promise program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-12-22 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-12-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr90 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AJR90.pdf |