WI AJR85 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-30-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: congratulating the Dane County Farmers' Market on its 45th anniversary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating the Dane County Farmers' Market on its 45th anniversary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-30-2018
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-03-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-03-20SenateConcurred in
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-11-14SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-11-14SenateRead and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2017-11-09SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-11-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-11-09HouseAdopted
2017-11-09HouseRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up
2017-11-09HouseRead and referred to Committee on Rules
2017-11-09HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback