WI AJR84 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing November 2017 as Prematurity Awareness Month.
Title
Recognizing November 2017 as Prematurity Awareness Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2017-11-09 | House | Adopted |
2017-11-09 | House | Senator Vinehout added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-07 | House | Representative Spiros added as a coauthor |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-11-06 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr84 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AJR84.pdf |