WI AJR77 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on August 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: convention of the States for one or more Constitutional amendments restraining abuses of power by the federal government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convention of the States for one or more Constitutional amendments restraining abuses of power by the federal government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - Assembly: Adopted (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-03-17SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2020-03-17SenateExecutive action taken
2020-02-28SenateRead and referred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts
2020-02-19SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-18HouseAdopted, Ayes 60, Noes 38
2020-02-13HousePlaced on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseReport adoption recommended by Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 2
2020-01-23HouseExecutive action taken
2019-11-13HousePublic hearing held
2019-09-09HouseRepresentative Skowronski added as a coauthor
2019-08-15HouseRepresentative Born added as a coauthor
2019-08-14HouseRead and referred to Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations
2019-08-14HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback