WI AJR77 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4 (1) (c) of article VI of the constitution; Relating to: appointment of treasurer in Milwaukee county (first consideration).
Title
Appointment of treasurer in Milwaukee county (first consideration).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and adopted (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and adopted (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-04-02 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate Amendment 1 adopted) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 29, Noes 4 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Carpenter |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and adopted, Ayes 88, Noes 9 |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Report adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2014-02-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-22 | House | Representative Kleefisch added as a coauthor |
2013-11-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2013-11-25 | House | Introduced |