WI AJR75 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Enrolled on November 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-06 - Report correctly enrolled on 11-6-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-06 - Report correctly enrolled on 11-6-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: designating the first week in October as Mental Illness Awareness Week in Wisconsin.
Title
Designating the first week in October as Mental Illness Awareness Week in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-06 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-6-2017 |
2017-10-31 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Concurred in |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-09-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-09-14 | House | Representatives Zepnick and Snyder added as coauthors |
2017-09-14 | House | Adopted |
2017-09-13 | House | Representatives Subeck and Tusler added as coauthors |
2017-09-13 | House | Senator Marklein added as a cosponsor |
2017-09-12 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Rules and placed on calendar 9-14-2017 pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2017-09-12 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-09-12 | House | Introduced |